WA SJR8207 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-15 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-15 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Constitution to allow a majority of voters voting to authorize school district bonds.
Title
Amending the Constitution to allow a majority of voters voting to authorize school district bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2023-12-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |