WI AB1023 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 13.205, 14.25, 20.445 (1) (bn), 20.455 (3) (ab), 20.765 (1) (c), 106.135 and 165.989 of the statutes; Relating to: interns employed by assembly and senate offices, the governor, and the Department of Justice, an intern placement program administered by the Department of Workforce Development, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Interns employed by assembly and senate offices, the governor, and the Department of Justice, an intern placement program administered by the Department of Workforce Development, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-04-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab1023 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB1023.pdf |