WI AB209 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Published 4-23-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Published 4-23-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 939.617 (2); and to amend 939.617 (1) of the statutes; relating to: mandatory minimum sentences for certain child sex offenses.
Title
Mandatory minimum sentences for certain child sex offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | House | Published 4-23-2012 |
2012-04-10 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-9-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 272 |
2012-04-05 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-03-27 | House | Report correctly enrolled |
2012-03-15 | House | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-15 | House | Senate amendment 1 concurred in |
2012-03-13 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:02 A.M. on 3-14-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 24 |
2012-03-09 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2012-03-09 | House | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate amendment 1 adopted) |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 adopted |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-7-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Report concurrence as amended recommended by committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Erpenbach |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2012-02-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-21 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 85, Noes 9 |
2012-02-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-02-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-21 | House | Assembly amendment 1 adopted |
2012-02-21 | House | Read a second time |
2012-02-16 | House | Placed on calendar 2-21-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-02-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2012-02-16 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2012-02-16 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2012-02-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2012-01-18 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Honadel |
2011-09-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-07-29 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2011-07-29 | House | Introduced |