WI AB209 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 767.401 (1) (d); to renumber and amend 767.401 (1) (a); to amend 767.401 (1) (b); and to create 767.401 (1) (a) 2. and 3. of the statutes; Relating to: mandatory parenting classes.
Title
Mandatory parenting classes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-09-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Mursau |
2019-06-06 | House | Representative Brandtjen added as a coauthor |
2019-05-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law |
2019-05-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab209 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB209.pdf |