WI AB232 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.19 (3) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: teacher preparatory programs and granting rule-making authority.
Title
Teacher preparatory programs and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-01-07 | House | Representative C. Taylor added as a coauthor |
2019-09-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-07-12 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2019-07-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-07-11 | House | Representatives Pope, Kitchens and Vruwink added as coauthors |
2019-05-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-05-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab232 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB232.pdf |