WI AB263 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Published 4-23-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Published 4-23-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 973.06 (1) (av) of the statutes; relating to: costs associated with providing false information to a law enforcement officer. (FE)
Title
Costs associated with providing false information to a law enforcement officer. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | House | Published 4-23-2012 |
2012-04-10 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-9-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 269 |
2012-04-05 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-03-09 | House | Report correctly enrolled |
2012-03-07 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-7-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2011-10-25 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-10-25 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2011-10-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-10-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-25 | House | Assembly amendment 1 adopted |
2011-10-25 | House | Read a second time |
2011-10-20 | House | Placed on calendar 10-25-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-10-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-20 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2011-10-20 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2011-10-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-10-17 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representatives Knodl and Krug |
2011-10-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-09-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-09-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-09-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-09-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2011-09-15 | House | Introduced |