WI AB338 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 24-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 24-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 50.40 of the statutes; Relating to: price transparency in hospitals and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Price transparency in hospitals and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-12-28 | House | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor |
2023-10-10 | House | LRB correction |
2023-07-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-06-30 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care |
2023-06-30 | House | Introduced |