WI AB350 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 946.79 (1) (f) (intro.) and 946.79 (1) (f) 1.; and to create 943.895, 946.79 (1) (f) 4. and 946.79 (1) (f) 5. of the statutes; Relating to: money laundering and providing a penalty.
Title
Money laundering and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2019-10-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-09-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-07-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-07-31 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab350 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB350.pdf |