WI AB411 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 632.895 (6); to amend 609.83 and 632.895 (6) (title); and to create 632.895 (6) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: cost sharing for insulin under health insurance policies and plans.
Title
Cost sharing for insulin under health insurance policies and plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-19 | House | Representatives Hebl and Haywood added as coauthors |
2019-09-20 | House | Commissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes |
2019-09-10 | House | Representative Considine added as a coauthor |
2019-09-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2019-09-05 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab411 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB411.pdf |