WI AB440 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 24-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 24-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 348.25 (4) (intro.); and to create 348.27 (20) of the statutes; Relating to: permits for the overweight transport of certain fluid milk products. (FE)
Title
Permits for the overweight transport of certain fluid milk products. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-01-23 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:19 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-01-04 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2024-01-04 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2023-12-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-11-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-11-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-07 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kurtz |
2023-09-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2023-09-28 | House | Introduced |