WI AB51 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 66.0501 (1); and to create 66.0501 (1) (b) and 165.85 (4) (a) 1m. of the statutes; Relating to: appointment of certain lawfully present aliens as law enforcement officers.
Title
Appointment of certain lawfully present aliens as law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Referred to committee on Senate Organization (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senator Hesselbein added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Referred to committee on Senate Organization, Ayes 22, Noes 10 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-02 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Representative Joers added as a coauthor |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2023-03-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-03-22 | House | Representative Drake added as a coauthor |
2023-03-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2023-03-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-03-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Read a second time |
2023-03-21 | House | Representatives Cabrera and Andraca added as coauthors |
2023-03-16 | House | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor |
2023-03-14 | House | Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-03-13 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2023-03-10 | House | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor |
2023-03-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-03-02 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell |
2023-02-28 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2023-02-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-02-22 | House | Representatives Stubbs and Subeck added as coauthors |
2023-02-22 | House | Senator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2023-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2023-02-20 | House | Introduced |