WI AB513 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.235 (1) (fe), 38.28 (1m) (a) 1., 71.06 (1p) (e), 71.06 (2) (g) 5., 71.06 (2) (h) 5., 71.06 (2e) (b), 71.09 (11) (f) and 560.205 (3) (d); and to create 20.143 (1) (cr), 20.292 (1) (cr), 38.31, 71.06 (1p) (f), 71.06 (2) (g) 6., 71.06 (2) (h) 6. and 560.147 of the statutes; relating to: the amounts appropriated for tuition grants and for Wisconsin higher education grants for University of Wisconsin system students, technical college students, and tribal college students; grants to technical college districts to reduce unemployment; grants to businesses to make capital expenditures; increasing the total amount of angel investment credits; creating a new individual income tax upper bracket; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; granting rule-making authority; and making appropriations.
Title
The amounts appropriated for tuition grants and for Wisconsin higher education grants for University of Wisconsin system students, technical college students, and tribal college students; grants to technical college districts to reduce unemployment; grants to businesses to make capital expenditures; increasing the total amount of angel investment credits; creating a new individual income tax upper bracket; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; granting rule-making authority; and making appropriations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-01-11 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-11-12 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-11-11 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-11-09 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-10-23 | Read first time and referred to joint committee on Finance | |
2009-10-23 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab513 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB513.pdf |