WI AB53 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 943.31 of the statutes; Relating to: threatening to communicate derogatory information.
Title
Threatening to communicate derogatory information.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Ott [R] | Rep. Mark Born [R] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. James Edming [R] |
Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Steve Doyle [D] |
Rep. David Murphy [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Published 3-31-2016 |
2016-03-31 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-30-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 335 |
2016-03-29 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2016 |
2016-03-21 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-21-2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-01-19 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-01-19 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-01-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-01-19 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2016-01-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-01-19 | House | Read a second time |
2016-01-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative J. Ott |
2015-11-03 | House | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 11-3-2015 |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative J. Ott |
2015-10-28 | House | Placed on calendar 11-3-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-10-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-10-13 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 10, Noes 2 |
2015-10-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-06-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2015-02-17 | House | Introduced |