WI AB549 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Published 4-26-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Published 4-26-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 448.50 (4) (b); to amend 462.04; and to create 448.56 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: the authority of physical therapists to order X-rays and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
The authority of physical therapists to order X-rays and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | House | Published 4-26-2016 |
2016-04-25 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-25-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 375 |
2016-04-21 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-21-2016 |
2016-03-21 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-21-2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:15 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-05 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 8, Noes 3 |
2016-02-03 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-02-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kolste |
2015-12-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-12-09 | House | Representative Kooyenga added as a coauthor |
2015-12-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2015-11-24 | House | Introduced |