WI AB553 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 36.11 (6) (c) and 38.04 (7m); and to create 36.41, 36.42, 38.34, 38.35 and 39.285 (1) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: free speech and academic freedom at University of Wisconsin System institutions and technical colleges, due process in disciplinary proceedings at University of Wisconsin System institutions and technical colleges, Wisconsin grant funding allocation, and causes of action against the Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System and technical college district boards. (FE)
Title
Free speech and academic freedom at University of Wisconsin System institutions and technical colleges, due process in disciplinary proceedings at University of Wisconsin System institutions and technical colleges, Wisconsin grant funding allocation, and causes of action against the Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System and technical college district boards. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-07 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-12-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Universities and Revenue |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2023-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-11-07 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 36 |
2023-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2023-11-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2023-11-06 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-11-02 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-11-02 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-11-02 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 10, Noes 4 |
2023-11-02 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 10, Noes 4 |
2023-11-02 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2023-11-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-11-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-01 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Nedweski |
2023-10-31 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Nedweski |
2023-10-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-10-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2023-10-23 | House | Introduced |