WI AB560 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 885.60 (2) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: the use of videoconferencing technology in certain civil actions. (FE)
Title
The use of videoconferencing technology in certain civil actions. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2023-11-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-11-14 | House | Representative Krug added as a coauthor |
2023-11-14 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2023-11-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-11-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-14 | House | Read a second time |
2023-11-13 | House | Representatives Gustafson and O'Connor added as coauthors |
2023-11-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-09 | House | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-11-09 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-11-09 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse Prevention, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2023-11-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-11-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-10-30 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2023-10-27 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Judiciary and referred to committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse Prevention pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2023-10-26 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-10-26 | House | Introduced |