WI AB562 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 48.357 (2r), 48.437 (2r), 48.64 (4) (a), 48.64 (4) (c) and 938.357 (2r); to amend 48.293 (2), 48.295 (1), 48.295 (3), 48.357 (1) (am) 2. a., 48.437 (2r) (title), 48.78 (2) (a), 938.293 (2), 938.295 (1) (b), 938.295 (3) and 938.78 (2) (a); and to create 48.357 (2r) (b), 48.437 (2r) (b), 48.64 (4) (a) 2., 48.64 (4) (c) 3. and 938.357 (2r) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: the rights of a foster parent or other physical custodian of a child on removal of the child from the person's home. (FE)
Title
The rights of a foster parent or other physical custodian of a child on removal of the child from the person's home. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-01-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-15 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-01-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-14 | House | Representative Milroy withdrawn as a coauthor |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on calendar 1-15-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2019-12-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-12-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2019-12-26 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2019-12-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-12-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-12-17 | House | Representative Snyder added as a coauthor |
2019-12-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Plumer |
2019-12-06 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Plumer |
2019-11-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-30 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2019-10-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-10-24 | House | Senator Feyen added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law |
2019-10-23 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab562 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB562.pdf |