WI AB691 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 102.07 (8) (a); and to create 73.03 (75), 102.07 (8) (bs), 104.01 (5k), 104.013, 108.02 (12) (cm), 109.01 (2m) and 109.013 of the statutes; Relating to: classification of motor vehicle operators as independent contractors or employees.
Title
Classification of motor vehicle operators as independent contractors or employees.
Sponsors
Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. David Armstrong [R] | Rep. Tyler August [R] | Rep. John Macco [R] |
Rep. David Steffen [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:41 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Integrated Employment, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-12-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-11-16 | House | Representative Murphy added as a coauthor |
2021-11-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Integrated Employment |
2021-11-12 | House | Introduced |