WI AB695 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-1-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-1-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.981 (2) (c), 106.54 (9) and 111.322 (2m) (bm); and to create 48.685 (6m) and 48.981 (2) (bg) of the statutes; relating to: requiring suspected drug activity on the part of a caregiver or nonclient resident of a child care provider to be reported to an immediate supervisor and to the sheriff and suspected or threatened child abuse or neglect on the part of such an individual to be reported under the child abuse and neglect reporting law and providing a penalty.
Title
Requiring suspected drug activity on the part of a caregiver or nonclient resident of a child care provider to be reported to an immediate supervisor and to the sheriff and suspected or threatened child abuse or neglect on the part of such an individual to be reported under the child abuse and neglect reporting law and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-13 | Withdrawn from committee on Children and Families and referred to committee on Rules pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) | |
2010-02-17 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-10 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-10 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-10 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-10 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-01 | Read first time and referred to committee on Children and Families | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab695 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB695.pdf |