WI AB76 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 343.17 (3) (b); and to create 343.177 of the statutes; relating to: requiring the Department of Transportation to establish rules allowing living will and health care power of attorney information to be included on driver's licenses, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority.
Title
Requiring the Department of Transportation to establish rules allowing living will and health care power of attorney information to be included on driver's licenses, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-04-07 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-04-07 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Health and Healthcare Reform, Ayes 7, Noes 4 | |
2009-04-07 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Health and Healthcare Reform, Ayes 7, Noes 4 | |
2009-04-01 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by committee on Health and Healthcare Reform | |
2009-04-01 | Executive action taken | |
2009-03-16 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-03-04 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-03-04 | Public hearing held | |
2009-03-03 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-02-20 | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Healthcare Reform | |
2009-02-20 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab76 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB76.pdf |