WI AB762 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 302.388 (3); and to create 146.82 (2) (a) 22., 252.15 (5) (a) 21., 302.388 (2) (g) and 302.388 (3) (b) of the statutes; relating to: informing correctional officers about inmates with contagious diseases.
Title
Informing correctional officers about inmates with contagious diseases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-12 | Withdrawn from committee on Corrections and the Courts and referred to committee on Criminal Justice pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) | |
2010-03-31 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-05 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-19 | Read first time and referred to committee on Corrections and the Courts | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab762 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB762.pdf |