WI AB765 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 224.71 (3) (b) 7. and 224.71 (4) (b) 9. and (6) (b) 4.; to renumber and amend 224.72 (4) (a) 2.; to amend 224.72 (4) (a) 4.; and to create 224.72 (4) (a) 2. a. and b. of the statutes; relating to: licensing requirements for mortgage bankers and mortgage brokers.
Title
Licensing requirements for mortgage bankers and mortgage brokers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-03-04 | Report passage recommended by committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 10, Noes 1 | |
2010-03-03 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-24 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time and referred to committee on Financial Institutions | |
2010-02-22 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab765 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB765.pdf |