WI AB794 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 160.07 (2); and to create 160.05 (7) and 160.07 (4m) of the statutes; Relating to: public notice and comment period for certain groundwater standards. (FE)
Title
Public notice and comment period for certain groundwater standards. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 36 |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-13 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 7, Noes 4 |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-30 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2020-01-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-29 | House | Representative Hutton added as a coauthor |
2020-01-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight |
2020-01-24 | House | Introduced |