WI AB850 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: modifying an administrative rule of the Department of Safety and Professional Services regarding renewal of a registered electrician enrollment for a youth apprentice. (FE)
Title
Modifying an administrative rule of the Department of Safety and Professional Services regarding renewal of a registered electrician enrollment for a youth apprentice. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Schraa [R] | Rep. Warren Petryk [R] | Rep. Gordon Hintz [D] | Sen. Dan Feyen [R] |
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-18 | House | Senator Larson added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab850 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB850.pdf |