WI AB894 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 93.90 (2) (c), 93.90 (3) (a) (intro.), 93.90 (3) (a) 5., 93.90 (3) (a) 6., 93.90 (3) (a) 8., 93.90 (3) (a) 9., 93.90 (3) (ae), 93.90 (3) (am), 93.90 (3) (ar) and 93.90 (4); to renumber 93.90 (3) (a) 1., 93.90 (3) (a) 3., 93.90 (3) (a) 4. and 93.90 (3) (f); to renumber and amend 93.90 (3) (a) 2., 93.90 (3) (b), 93.90 (3) (c), 93.90 (3) (d) and 93.90 (3) (e); to amend 93.90 (1m) (b), 93.90 (2) (a), 93.90 (2) (d), 93.90 (2) (e) 2., 93.90 (5) (title), 93.90 (5) (a), 93.90 (5) (b), 93.90 (5) (bm), 93.90 (5) (c), 93.90 (5) (d) and 93.90 (5) (f); to repeal and recreate 93.90 (3) (title); and to create 15.135 (2), 93.90 (1m) (bm), 93.90 (1m) (dr), 93.90 (1m) (eg), 93.90 (1m) (er), 93.90 (1m) (g), 93.90 (1m) (h), 93.90 (1m) (i), 93.90 (2) (am), 93.90 (2) (f), 93.90 (2m), 93.90 (3) (g), 93.90 (3) (h) (intro.), 93.90 (3) (h) 5., 93.90 (3) (i) 1., 93.90 (3) (i) 2. (intro.), 93.90 (3) (j), 93.90 (3) (L) and 93.90 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: livestock facility siting and expansion and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Livestock facility siting and expansion and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:18 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 10, Noes 5 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-14 | House | Representative Loudenbeck added as a coauthor |
2020-02-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-02-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-11 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab894 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB894.pdf |