WI AB918 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Published 3-23-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Published 3-23-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 452.14 (2); to renumber and amend 452.14 (4m) (a); to amend 452.01 (5g), 452.14 (4r), 452.17 (1), 452.17 (3), 452.19 (1), 452.23 (title) and 452.23 (4); to repeal and recreate 452.23 (3); and to create 452.07 (4), 452.12 (5) (e), 452.14 (2) (b), 452.14 (2) (c), 452.14 (3) (im), 452.14 (4m) (a) 1., 452.23 (5) and 710.13 of the statutes; Relating to: various changes regarding the laws governing real estate practice, disclosures regarding real property wholesalers, and providing a penalty.
Title
Various changes regarding the laws governing real estate practice, disclosures regarding real property wholesalers, and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Published 3-23-2024 |
2024-03-25 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 208 |
2024-03-18 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024 |
2024-03-15 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-21 | House | Representative Penterman added as a coauthor |
2024-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:37 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-19 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 10, Noes 5 |
2024-02-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Krug |
2024-02-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-01-24 | House | Representative Ortiz-Velez withdrawn as a coauthor |
2024-01-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2024-01-05 | House | Introduced |