WI AB94 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 767.511 (1m) (hs) and 767.553 (4) (c) 2.; and to create 49.22 (13) (am), 767.001 (1p), 767.57 (4m) and 767.775 of the statutes; Relating to: reduction of child support payments during incarceration.
Title
Reduction of child support payments during incarceration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-12-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-12-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-09-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-06-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-04-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks |
2019-03-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law |
2019-03-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab94 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB94.pdf |