WI AJR45 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming September 7, 2019, as Great Lakes-St. Lawrence Appreciation Day.
Title
Proclaiming September 7, 2019, as Great Lakes-St. Lawrence Appreciation Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-12 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2019-09-03 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2019-05-16 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-05-16 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr45 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AJR45.pdf |