WI AJR93 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 6 of article I, section 8 (2) of article I and section 8 (3) of article I of the constitution; Relating to: eligibility and conditions for release prior to conviction of persons accused of certain crimes and considerations for imposing bail (first consideration).
Title
Eligibility and conditions for release prior to conviction of persons accused of certain crimes and considerations for imposing bail (first consideration).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and adopted (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and adopted, Ayes 69, Noes 24 |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Duchow |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Duchow |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-21 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:57 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-21 | House | Report adoption as amended of Assembly Joint Resolution 93 recommended by Committee on Constitution and Ethics, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2018-02-21 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Constitution and Ethics, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-24 | House | Senator Testin added as a cosponsor |
2018-01-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Duchow |
2018-01-12 | House | Representative Loudenbeck added as a coauthor |
2018-01-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-01-10 | House | Senator Feyen added as a cosponsor |
2018-01-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Constitution and Ethics |
2018-01-08 | House | Introduced |