WI SB100 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 973.045 (2); to amend 23.85, 59.40 (2) (n), 973.045 (1) (a) and 973.045 (1) (b); and to create 59.25 (3) (gm), 59.54 (28), 973.045 (1r) (a) 4., 973.045 (2) (b) and 973.045 (3) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: increasing the crime victim and witness assistance surcharge, dedicating funds for crime prevention organizations, and creating local crime prevention funding boards. (FE)
Title
Increasing the crime victim and witness assistance surcharge, dedicating funds for crime prevention organizations, and creating local crime prevention funding boards. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Labor |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb100 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB100.pdf |