WI SB111 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.60 (2) (a) 8. and 119.23 (2) (a) 8. of the statutes; Relating to: allowing private schools participating in a parental choice program to provide hours of direct pupil instruction virtually.
Title
Allowing private schools participating in a parental choice program to provide hours of direct pupil instruction virtually.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | LRB correction |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kooyenga |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb111 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB111.pdf |