WI SB129 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 340.01 (30) (b); to consolidate, renumber and amend 340.01 (30) (intro.) and (a); to amend 23.335 (1) (q), 70.111 (1), 194.01 (7), 340.01 (29m) (bm), 340.01 (35), 340.01 (74p) (c), 341.05 (23), 346.02 (4) (title) and 346.02 (4) (a); and to create 340.01 (15ph), 346.806, 347.02 (1) (em), 347.489 (3m) and 349.18 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: electric bicycles and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Electric bicycles and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Roth |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Roth |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb129 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB129.pdf |