WI SB167 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 961.41 (1q); to renumber and amend 961.41 (1) (h) 1.; to amend 59.54 (25) (a) (intro.), 66.0107 (1) (bm), 961.41 (1m) (h) 1., 961.41 (1r), 961.41 (3g) (e) and 961.46; to repeal and recreate 961.41 (1q) (title); and to create 961.41 (1) (h) 1g. and 961.41 (1q) (b) and (c) of the statutes; Relating to: possession of 25 grams or less of marijuana and distribution and delivery of marijuana. (FE)
Title
Possession of 25 grams or less of marijuana and distribution and delivery of marijuana. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb167 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB167.pdf |