WI SB169 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Published 3-28-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Published 3-28-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 106.361 of the statutes; Relating to: establishing a hotline for employers interested in hiring individuals with a conviction record. (FE)
Title
Establishing a hotline for employers interested in hiring individuals with a conviction record. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Published 3-28-2024 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-27-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 228 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-21-2024 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2024-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-13 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 96, Noes 0 |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2024-02-08 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2023-10-19 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-09-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-08-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Introduced |