WI SB2 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 109.09 (2) (c) 1., 109.09 (2) (c) 2. and 109.09 (2) (c) 3.; to renumber and amend 109.09 (2) (c) 1m.; and to amend 109.03 (5), 109.03 (6), 109.09 (1), 109.09 (2) (a), 109.09 (2) (b) 1., 109.09 (2) (b) 2., 109.09 (2) (b) 3. and 109.11 (2) (a) of the statutes; relating to: the filing of a wage claim or the bringing of a wage claim action by a collective bargaining representative on behalf of an employee and the priority of a wage claim lien over a prior lien of a commercial lending institution and over the rights of a purchaser of any property of the employer.
Title
The filing of a wage claim or the bringing of a wage claim action by a collective bargaining representative on behalf of an employee and the priority of a wage claim lien over a prior lien of a commercial lending institution and over the rights of a purchaser of any property of the employer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-22 | Representative Steinbrink added as a cosponsor | |
2010-04-20 | Made a special order of business at 11:19 A.M. on 4-22-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 | |
2010-04-20 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-20 | Report concurrence as amended recommended by committee on Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 3 | |
2010-04-20 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 3 | |
2010-04-20 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by committee on Labor | |
2010-04-20 | Executive action taken | |
2009-03-19 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Nass | |
2009-03-18 | Public hearing held | |
2009-02-17 | Printed engrossed by the direction of the Assembly Chief Clerk | |
2009-02-12 | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor | |
2009-02-12 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-10 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-02-10 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 17, Noes 15 | |
2009-02-10 | Rules suspended | |
2009-02-10 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-02-10 | Senate amendment 2 withdrawn and returned to author | |
2009-02-10 | Senate amendment 2 offered by Senator Risser | |
2009-02-10 | Senate amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-02-10 | Senate amendment 1 to Senate amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-02-10 | Senate amendment 1 to Senate amendment 1 offered by Senators Coggs and Kreitlow | |
2009-02-10 | Read a second time | |
2009-02-10 | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1) | |
2009-02-06 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Lehman | |
2009-02-05 | Placed on calendar 2-10-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-01-30 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-01-30 | Report passage recommended by committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | |
2009-01-29 | Executive action taken | |
2009-01-29 | Public hearing held | |
2009-01-23 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-01-09 | Senator Jauch added as a coauthor | |
2009-01-08 | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs | |
2009-01-08 | Introduced |