WI SB403 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 440.14 (1) (b) of the statutes; relating to: authorizing the release of certain personal identifying information collected by the Department of Regulation and Licensing.
Title
Authorizing the release of certain personal identifying information collected by the Department of Regulation and Licensing.
Sponsors
Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Sen. Jon Erpenbach [D] | Sen. Glenn Grothman [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] |
Rep. Joseph Parisi [D] | Sen. Fred Risser [D] | Rep. John Townsend [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Published 6-1-2010 | |
2010-05-18 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-18-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 388 | |
2010-05-13 | Presented to the Governor on 5-13-2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Report correctly enrolled on 4-28-2010 | |
2010-04-23 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-22 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-22 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-22 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-20 | Made a special order of business at 11:33 A.M. on 4-22-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-03-04 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Personal Privacy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-02 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-02 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-24 | Read first time and referred to committee on Personal Privacy | |
2010-02-18 | Received from Senate | |
2010-02-16 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-02-16 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended | |
2010-02-16 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-02-16 | Senate amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-02-16 | Read a second time | |
2010-02-11 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Erpenbach | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on calendar 2-16-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-01-27 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-01-27 | Report passage recommended by committee on Health, Health Insurance, Privacy, Property Tax Relief, and Revenue, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-01-27 | Executive action taken | |
2010-01-13 | Public hearing held | |
2009-12-04 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-11-18 | Read first time and referred to committee on Health, Health Insurance, Privacy, Property Tax Relief, and Revenue | |
2009-11-18 | Introduced |