WI SB422 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 7.53 (4), 7.60 (6) and 7.70 (5) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: time for issuing a certificate of election.
Title
Time for issuing a certificate of election.
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] | Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] | Rep. Gae Magnafici [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] |
Rep. Rick Gundrum [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Published 3-4-2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 182 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:40 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Introduced |