WI SB467 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.445 (1) (fc) and 106.15; to amend 16.306 (2) (a), 16.3085 (2) (b) 2., 38.40 (2), 46.56 (14) (a), 49.143 (2) (a) 4m. e., 49.163 (4) (intro.), 49.265 (3) (b) 11., 49.265 (4) (a), 49.265 (4) (b), 49.265 (4) (c), 49.79 (9) (a) 1., 60.85 (7) (a), 60.85 (7) (b), 66.1103 (6m), 66.1105 (6c) (a), 66.1105 (6c) (b), 71.07 (2dx) (a) 5., 71.07 (5r) (b) 2., 71.28 (1dx) (a) 5., 71.47 (5r) (b) 2., 76.636 (1) (e) 12., 85.20 (4m) (a) 8. b., 106.11, 106.13 (2), 106.16 (2), 106.27 (1m), 109.07 (1m) (a), 115.28 (24), 238.30 (4m) and 946.13 (10); and to create 16.03 (2) (d), 20.435 (5) (cg), 20.435 (5) (em), 20.437 (2) (cs), 20.445 (1) (fc), 20.505 (7) (fk), 36.25 (56), 46.483, 46.538, 48.47 (8) (d), 49.45 (31m), 49.675, 49.82 (3), 71.07 (8m), 71.10 (4) (cs), 106.115, 115.28 (66), 234.253 and 234.38 of the statutes; Relating to: housing and homelessness; workforce development; community action agencies; poverty reports; mental health; public assistance advisory committee; economic security; adverse childhood experiences reports; creating a nonrefundable individual income tax credit for household and dependent care services; reimbursement for nonemergency medical transportation services; urban mass transit aid; and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Housing and homelessness; workforce development; community action agencies; poverty reports; mental health; public assistance advisory committee; economic security; adverse childhood experiences reports; creating a nonrefundable individual income tax credit for household and dependent care services; reimbursement for nonemergency medical transportation services; urban mass transit aid; and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development |
2019-09-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb467 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB467.pdf |