WI SB511 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 102.42 (1); and to create 102.17 (9), 102.42 (1p) and 102.44 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: claims for compensation for post-traumatic stress disorder by police officers and fire fighters under the worker's compensation law. (FE)
Title
Claims for compensation for post-traumatic stress disorder by police officers and fire fighters under the worker's compensation law. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Representative Schraa added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:46 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Horlacher |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Senators Carpenter, Testin and Larson added as coauthors |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Representatives Ohnstad, Plumer, Billings, Sargent, Thiesfeldt, Rohrkaste, Loudenbeck and Zamarripa added as cosponsors |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a coauthor |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Representative Goyke added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2019-10-18 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb511 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB511.pdf |