WI SB572 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 25.18 (1) (a), 25.18 (1) (f), 25.18 (1) (m), 84.01 (13), 84.01 (31), 84.06 (2) (a), 84.06 (3), 84.06 (4), 85.015, 102.81 (2), 165.08, 165.25 (11), 221.0903 (4) (b), 801.02 (1), 803.09 (1) and (2), 804.01 (2) (intro.), 805.04 (2m) and 893.981; and to create 16.771, 16.871, 20.932 and 66.0902 of the statutes; relating to: false claims against the state or a local government and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
False claims against the state or a local government and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Lassa [D] | Sen. Kathleen Vinehout [D] | Rep. Andrew Jorgensen [D] | Sen. Kelda Roys [D] |
Rep. Robert Turner [D] | Sen. Janis Ringhand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-04-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-04-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-04-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb572 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/SB572.pdf |