WI SB626 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 343.44 (4), 343.44 (5), 344.62 (2), 344.64, 344.65 (1) (b), 628.34 (14) (d) 2. c. and 344.65 (2); to renumber and amend 344.25 and 344.65 (1) (a); to amend 165.755 (1) (b), 302.46 (1) (a), 343.05 (2) (a) (intro.), 343.05 (3) (a), 343.05 (6), 343.44 (1) (a), 343.44 (1) (b), 344.25 (title), 344.26 (1) (a), 344.26 (1) (b) (intro.), 344.26 (1) (b) 1., 344.62 (1), 344.65 (1) (c), 757.05 (1) (a), 814.63 (1) (c), 814.63 (2), 814.65 (1), 814.85 (1) (a) and 814.86 (1); to repeal and recreate 344.26 (title); and to create 341.08 (1g), 341.10 (2) (bm), 343.05 (5m), 343.21 (1) (jg), 344.25 (2m), 344.26 (1) (am), 344.65 (1) (a) 2., 344.65 (1) (a) 3. and 344.65 (1) (a) 4. of the statutes; Relating to: penalties for violations related to the motor vehicle liability insurance requirement, proof of financial responsibility, requirements for registering motor vehicles, operating a vehicle without an operator's license or after suspension or revocation of an operating privilege, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Penalties for violations related to the motor vehicle liability insurance requirement, proof of financial responsibility, requirements for registering motor vehicles, operating a vehicle without an operator's license or after suspension or revocation of an operating privilege, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Representative Plumer added as a cosponsor |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb626 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB626.pdf |