WI SB632 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 283.90 of the statutes; Relating to: notifying counties of certain water pollution violations, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Notifying counties of certain water pollution violations, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Representative Quinn added as a cosponsor |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb632 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB632.pdf |