WI SB651 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 84.10341 of the statutes; Relating to: designating and marking the Corporal Benjamin H. Neal Memorial Highway. (FE)
Title
Designating and marking the Corporal Benjamin H. Neal Memorial Highway. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Introduced |