WI SB66 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Passed on August 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-07 - Published 8-5-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Passed on August 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-07 - Published 8-5-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 343.17 (3) (d) 1g. of the statutes; Relating to: seasonal period for farm service license endorsement.
Title
Seasonal period for farm service license endorsement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-07 | Senate | Published 8-5-2023 |
2023-08-07 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 8-4-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 28 |
2023-08-02 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 8-2-2023 |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-28-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-06-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-06-21 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2023-06-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-06-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-06-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-06-21 | House | Read a second time |
2023-06-21 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2023-06-20 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor |
2023-06-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Plumer |
2023-06-15 | House | Placed on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-06-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-04-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-19-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced |