WI SB731 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 302.081 and 302.082 of the statutes; Relating to: recreational opportunities and structured programming for inmates in state correctional institutions and county jails and houses of correction. (FE)
Title
Recreational opportunities and structured programming for inmates in state correctional institutions and county jails and houses of correction. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-27 | Senate | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Introduced |