WI SB754 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 175.60 (2g) (a) and (5) (a) 6., 948.605 (1) (b) and 948.605 (2) (a); to repeal and recreate 948.605 (2) (b) 1r.; and to create 948.605 (1) (ak) and (aq) of the statutes; Relating to: possession of a firearm by a licensee in a place of worship located on the grounds of a private school.
Title
Possession of a firearm by a licensee in a place of worship located on the grounds of a private school.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-12-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-12-08 | Senate | Introduced |