WI SB788 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-9)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-9)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create subchapter III of chapter 153 [precedes 153.85] of the statutes; Relating to: opioid and methamphetamine data system and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Opioid and methamphetamine data system and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator LeMahieu |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator LeMahieu |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Representative Brostoff added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb788 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB788.pdf |