WI SB838 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 121.08 (4) (b) 1. and 3.; to consolidate, renumber and amend 121.08 (4) (b) (intro.) and 2.; to amend 115.7915 (4m) (f) 1. a., c., d., df. and dh., 118.60 (4d) (a), 118.60 (4d) (b) 1. a., b., c. and d., 121.07 (2) (b), 121.07 (2) (c) and 121.137 (2); and to create 115.7915 (1) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: reductions to state aid paid to school districts for payments made under parental choice programs and the Special Needs Scholarship Program. (FE)
Title
Reductions to state aid paid to school districts for payments made under parental choice programs and the Special Needs Scholarship Program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Representative Green added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-12-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2023-12-26 | Senate | Introduced |