WI SB95 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 36.28, 38.25 and 39.55 of the statutes; Relating to: permissible financial aid reductions in higher education. (FE)
Title
Permissible financial aid reductions in higher education. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Rachael Cabral-Guevara [R] | Rep. Shae Sortwell [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Rep. David Armstrong [R] |
Rep. Elijah Behnke [R] | Rep. James Edming [R] | Rep. Nate Gustafson [R] | Rep. Donna Rozar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-08-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Introduced |