WV HB203 | 2014 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Chapter 2, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Chapter 2, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to extend the deadlines for electrical inspections of boat docks and marinas, and compliance with Chapter 20, Article 9 of the West Virginia Code.
Title
Relating to boat dock and marina safety
Sponsors
Del. Tim Miley [D] | Del. Tim Armstead [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 8) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 7) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 544) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 543) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 7) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 544) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 543) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | House | Chapter 2, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2014 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/29/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-05-29 | House | Approved by Governor 5/29/14 |
2014-05-21 | House | Approved by Governor 5/29/14 - House Journal |
2014-05-21 | House | To Governor 5/23/14 - House Journal |
2014-05-23 | House | To Governor 5/23/14 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | To Governor 5/23/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-05-21 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 8) |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 7) |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-05-21 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-05-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 544) |
2014-05-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 543) |
2014-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-05-21 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Daily Calendar |
2014-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-05-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-05-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-05-19 | House | Reference dispensed |
2014-05-19 | House | Immediate consideration |
2014-05-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-05-19 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-05-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 9 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 9 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |